TX HB1164 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the Texas Education Agency to conduct a study to develop a writing assessment method for public school students and establish a pilot program to administer the assessment method developed.
Title
Relating to requiring the Texas Education Agency to conduct a study to develop a writing assessment method for public school students and establish a pilot program to administer the assessment method developed.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - HB 1164Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1164Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Tinderholt (Y: 20 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Simmons (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1164Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Tinderholt (Y: 20 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Simmons (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-04-29 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-29 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
ENGLISH LANGUAGE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
ENGLISH LANGUAGE