TX HB1163 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for membership and funding of benefits for certain law enforcement, custodial, and other peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for membership and funding of benefits for certain law enforcement, custodial, and other peace officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Pensions
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback