TX HB115 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the value of a residential dwelling that may be offered or awarded as a prize at a charitable raffle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the value of a residential dwelling that may be offered or awarded as a prize at a charitable raffle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#545 (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback