TX HB1139 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#810 (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#810 (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#810 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amended 1-S. Thompson |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Co-author authorized