TX HB113 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the vehicle description on an application for the registration of an automated motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the vehicle description on an application for the registration of an automated motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#497 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#497 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration