TX HB1113 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state contract limitations and programs for sex trafficking prevention and victim treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state contract limitations and programs for sex trafficking prevention and victim treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1194 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1194
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-S. Davis
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback