TX HB1113 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the standard of review for a determination of standing in a contested case hearing conducted by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the standard of review for a determination of standing in a contested case hearing conducted by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-21 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2015-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Environment--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB1113 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB01113I.htm |