TX HB1111 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the child safety zone applicable to registered sex offenders and to certain other persons who are released on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the child safety zone applicable to registered sex offenders and to certain other persons who are released on parole or to mandatory supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1930 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - Motion fails RV#1906 (Y: 67 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-26 - House - HB 1111 Third Reading House (Y: 67 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseMotion fails
2017-05-26HouseMotion to refuse to concur in Senate amdts.
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-22HouseRead first time
2017-01-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1111
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01111I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01111H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01111E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01111S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01111F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1111&RcdVtNo=1049&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1111&RcdVtNo=1906&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1111&RcdVtNo=1930&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback