TX HB1111 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Williamson County Municipal Utility District No. 23; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Williamson County Municipal Utility District No. 23; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - House - HB 1111Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16 Effective immediately
2015-06-16 Filed without the Governor's signature
2015-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-23SenateRecord vote
2015-05-23SenatePassed
2015-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-23SenateRecord vote
2015-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HousePassed
2015-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-07HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2015-03-02HouseRead first time
2015-02-09HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2015-02-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback