TX HB111 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school policy and training for public school employees addressing the prevention of sexual abuse, sex trafficking, and other maltreatment of certain children.
Title
Relating to public school policy and training for public school employees addressing the prevention of sexual abuse, sex trafficking, and other maltreatment of certain children.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#60 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#60 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | House | Record vote RV#60 |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-02-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING