TX HB11 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback