TX HB1097 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the processing and sale of kratom and kratom products; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the processing and sale of kratom and kratom products; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#611 (Y: 118 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 2nd time RV#571 (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#611
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#571
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB821 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1097
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01097I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01097H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01097E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01097S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01097I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01097H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01097H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01097E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01097E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1097&RcdVtNo=571&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1097&RcdVtNo=611&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021

Bill Comments

feedback