TX HB1094 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to workers' compensation death benefit eligibility for certain spouses of first responders killed in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation death benefit eligibility for certain spouses of first responders killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] |
Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 1094Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1094Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1094Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |