TX HB1087 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the offense of bestiality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the offense of bestiality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseRecommitted to committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback