TX HB1080 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procedural measures in a suit affecting a parent-child relationship to protect a child against child neglect or physical or sexual abuse.
Title
Relating to certain procedural measures in a suit affecting a parent-child relationship to protect a child against child neglect or physical or sexual abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE