TX HB1079 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the appellate process for the community development block grant program.
Title
Relating to the appellate process for the community development block grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-13 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-04-30 | Rereferred to committee | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-07 | Record vote | |
2009-04-07 | Passed | |
2009-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-06 | Postponed | |
2009-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Housing
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
RURAL COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Housing
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
RURAL COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF