TX HB1069 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of and payment for certain health care services provided through workers' compensation health care networks to fire protection personnel.
Title
Relating to the provision of and payment for certain health care services provided through workers' compensation health care networks to fire protection personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1069 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01069I.htm |