TX HB1044 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-21)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of a segment of Farm-to-Market Road 423 in Denton County as the U.S. Army Sergeant Enrique Mondragon Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of a segment of Farm-to-Market Road 423 in Denton County as the U.S. Army Sergeant Enrique Mondragon Memorial Highway.

Sponsors

Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Scott Turner [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. Myra Crownover [R]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Marsha Farney [R]Rep. Allen Fletcher [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. Rick Galindo [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Marisa Marquez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Gilbert Pena [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Stuart Spitzer [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Molly White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Jane Nelson [R]

Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - House - HB 1044Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09 Effective immediately
2015-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-23SenateRecord vote
2015-05-23SenatePassed
2015-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-23SenateRecord vote
2015-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-11SenateReferred to Transportation
2015-05-11SenateRead first time
2015-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseRecord vote
2015-05-05HousePassed
2015-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-05HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-03-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-03-26HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2015-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2015-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2015-03-05HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Transportation
2015-03-02HouseRead first time
2015-01-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback