TX HB1023 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the commissioner of education to grant additional charters for certain open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to requiring the commissioner of education to grant additional charters for certain open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools