TX HB1019 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - Referred to Ways & Means
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - Referred to Ways & Means
Summary
Relating to the total revenue exemption for the franchise tax.
Title
Relating to the total revenue exemption for the franchise tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB193 (Same As) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Finance
HB720 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
HB1220 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
HB720 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
HB1220 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee