TX HB1015 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to warning signs posted by certain food service establishments that prepare food items containing peanut products.
Title
Relating to warning signs posted by certain food service establishments that prepare food items containing peanut products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Business & Commerce--General
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions