TX HB10 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maternal morbidity and pregnancy-related deaths.
Title
Relating to maternal morbidity and pregnancy-related deaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#29 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-01 | House | Passed |
2017-08-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-31 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-07-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-31 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-07-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-07-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-07-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women