TN SR0178 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Emily Gibson
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and commend Emily Gibson, winner of the Tennessee State FFA Speech Contest.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |