TN SR0174 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
International Maternal Health and Rights Day
Title
A RESOLUTION to celebrate International Maternal Health and Rights Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0930) |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |