TN SR0142 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Ward Crutchfield
Title
Senator Ward Crutchfield
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Ronald Ramsey [R] | Sen. Thelma Harper [D] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |