TN SR0134 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jim Hall
Title
Jim Hall
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Calendar Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |