TN SR0090 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joel Aaron Duke, Eagle Scout.
Title
Joel Aaron Duke, Eagle Scout.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Filed for intro. |