TN SR0084 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jo Ann Street

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor Jo Ann Street in celebration of Women's History Month in Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03SenateWithdrawn.
2023-04-03SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback