TN SR0055 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Uziel Soto, Valedictorian, Oakhaven High School

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Uziel Soto, 2021 Valedictorian of Oakhaven High School.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-28SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback