TN SR0027 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Marla Higginbotham, 60th birthday
Title
Marla Higginbotham, 60th birthday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |