TN SR0024 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-24 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-24 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Steve Veesart
Title
Steve Veesart
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-02-24 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-02-23 | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 02/23/2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Filed for intro. |