TN SJR1410 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Simon Rosenbaum
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Simon Rosenbaum for exemplary service as a legislative intern.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-16 | House | Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2024-04-16 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |