TN SJR1237 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dakota Teamer
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Dakota Teamer for exemplary service as a legislative intern.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-28 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |