TN SJR1182 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Bobby Qualls
Title
Bobby Qualls
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-14 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-14 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Consent cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-04 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | S. Reset on cal. for 6/2/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | R/S, Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar for 5/24/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (3) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-05-11 | Filed for intro. |