TN SJR1021 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Prayer Breakfast, 50th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the fiftieth anniversary of the Tennessee Prayer Breakfast.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |