TN SJR0966 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts "Smoky Mountain Rain" as an official state song.
Title
Adopts "Smoky Mountain Rain" as an official state song.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 1 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-05-05 | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-29 | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Rec. for adoption by S. S&L Govt. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Govt Comm. on 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-04-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-04-12 | Filed for intro. |