TN SJR0845 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Josh Wayman, University of Tennessee Health Science Center advisory board
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Dr. Josh Wayman to the advisory board for the University of Tennessee Health Science Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-14 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |