TN SJR0803 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns 2023 session of 113th General Assembly on April 21, 2023; convenes 2024 session on January 9, 2024.
Title
A RESOLUTION to provide for the adjournment of the 2023 session of the One Hundred Thirteenth General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | House | R/S Concurred, Ayes 68, Nays 18, PNV 0 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |