TN SJR0781 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Helen "Tootie" Haskins

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Helen "Tootie" Haskins

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-02HouseConcurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-29HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/18
2018-03-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-29SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2018-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-26SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-03-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback