TN SJR0763 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to clarify the constitutional language that currently prohibits the levying of a tax on any class of income, other than income derived from stocks and bonds, and to prohibit any tax levied on or measured by employer payrolls.
Title
Proposes an amendment to clarify the constitutional language that currently prohibits the levying of a tax on any class of income, other than income derived from stocks and bonds, and to prohibit any tax levied on or measured by employer payrolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT THIRD AND FINAL READING (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/28/2010 Mtg. canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-31 | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-29 | Adopted, as am., Ayes 25, Nays 7 | |
2010-03-29 | Passed 3rd reading, as amended. | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Passed 2nd reading, as amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Passed 1st reading, as amended. | |
2010-03-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0942) | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Passed 2nd reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/15/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Passed 1st reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. | |
2010-02-05 | Filed for intro. | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. |