TN SJR0656 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Imagination Library, 100 millionth donation
Title
Imagination Library, 100 millionth donation
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Thelma Harper [D] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-12 | House | Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-03-08 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 3-12-18 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |