TN SJR0623 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-04 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-04 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Gen. William J. Hardee Memorial Bridge," S.R. 269 in Bedford County
Title
"Gen. William J. Hardee Memorial Bridge," S.R. 269 in Bedford County
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/04/2010 | |
2010-02-02 | Rec. for adoption by S. F,W&M Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 02/02/2010 | |
2009-06-17 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. for adoption by S. Trans. Comm. ref to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Trans. Comm. on 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2009-06-02 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-06-02 | Filed for intro. |