TN SJR0604 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Names the visitor center at Tipton-Haynes Historic Site in honor of Penny McLaughlin.
Title
Names the visitor center at Tipton-Haynes Historic Site in honor of Penny McLaughlin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |