TN SJR0555 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William L. Campbell, Sr., State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
William L. Campbell, Sr., State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |