TN SJR0515 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
City of White House, 50th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate the citizens of the City of White House upon the fiftieth anniversary of the city's incorporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |