TN SJR0482 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Tennessee Tree Day," February 24, 2018
Title
"Tennessee Tree Day," February 24, 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-15 | House | Ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/8/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-15 | House | Ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |