TN SJR0208 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Alan D. Wilson, Board of Trustees of the University of Tennessee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alan D. Wilson, Board of Trustees of the University of Tennessee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-14HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-11SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback