TN SJR0201 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. David "Hank" Wright, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Title
Dr. David "Hank" Wright, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | House | Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |