TN SJR0154 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: FINAL CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third and Final Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third and Final Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-02 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Final Calendar for 5/2/19 |
2019-04-30 | House | Reset on cal. for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate on second reading, as amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate on first reading, as amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0318) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate on second reading, as amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate on first reading, as amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0096) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee with a negative recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |