TN SJR0123 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Bill Ortwein

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bill Ortwein

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-02-19SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-02-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-14HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-14HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-02-12HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/14/19
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-11SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/11/2019
2019-02-07SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 2/11/2019
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/7/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback